ACE DEBT AND POVERTY ACTION LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in aspects of money management.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 April 2003: Standard registration
- 02 September 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.99k | £14.54k | £4.05k | £875 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.02k | £9.87k | £4.71k | £13.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 28 August 2008 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 10 September 2008 | 42 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 25 June 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 09 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | 15 September 2006 | 47 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | 19 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | 19 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 4 SEPTEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ASPECTS OF MONEY MANAGEMENT AND DEBT REDUCTION AND IN PARTICULAR MATTERS PERTAINING TO CREDIT UNIONS AND THEIR POTENTIAL ROLE IN RELIEVING POVERTY, AND TO IDENTIFY AND DELIVER PRACTICAL INITIATIVES TO TRY TO RELIEVE DEBT AND/OR POVERTY; AND (2) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO THE PUBLIC IN THE KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS PERTINENT TO THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF CREDIT UNIONS TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST COMMUNITIES IN AREAS WHICH ARE IN SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION WHICH ARE IN NEED OF SUCH RELIEF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window