Accounts and annual returns ST MICHAELS SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1097225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 September 2023 21 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2021 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2020 22 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2019 21 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2019 Not Required