THE TURNEY VILLAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 15 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Letitia Pamela Campbell Glaister | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY WHITTON-SPRIGGS | Trustee | 05 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT GEORGE CHAMBERS | Trustee | 14 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA ELIZABETH ROSINA PARKER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.05k | £10.89k | £12.81k | £17.06k | £16.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.42k | £1.08k | £9.77k | £8.78k | £8.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 May 2022 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT IPSWICH PROBATE REGISTRY ON 17TH JUNE 2002
Charitable objects
I GIVE TO MY TRUSTEES THE SUM OF ONE HUNDRED THOUSAND POUNDS (ú100,000) (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS 'THE TURNEY VILLAGE TRUST') TO BE HELD BY THEM UPON TRUST TO INVEST THE SAME AND TO APPLY IN SUCH WAYS AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE - 1. NOT LESS THAN 50% OF THE INCOME THEREOF IN ANY ONE YEAR FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP USE AND BENEFIT OF THE REED VILLAGE HALL AS MY TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SEE FIT AND 2. UP TO 50% OF THE INCOME IN ANY ONE ACCOUNTING YEAR - 2.1 FOR KEEPING THE GRAVEYARD OF THE REED PARISH CHURCH AND THE GRAVEYARD OF THERFIELD PARISH CHURCH IN GOOD ORDER AND REPAIR. 2.2 FOR THE REPAIR AND UPKEEP OF THE EXTERNAL AND INTERNAL FABRIC OF REED PARISH CHURCH.
Area of benefit
THERFIELD AND REED, HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
JOHN STREET
ROYSTON
HERTFORDSHIRE
SG8 9BG
- Phone:
- 01763295852
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window