Accounts and annual returns MIDLANDS REGEN LIMITED

Charity Number: 1099388
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016
Annual return 31 March 2015
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015
Annual return 31 March 2014 26 May 2015 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 28 May 2014 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 28 May 2014 117 days late