LANCASTER SINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public performances in a variety of venues ; wide range of musical programmes ; marking special occasions ; encouraging new ,especially young , musicians ,both vocal and instrumental .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
46 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 19 September 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr CHRISTOPHER JOHN HAUGHTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sally Elisa Lowton | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michele Allen | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alan Crameri | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham Bartram | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Pooley | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Abraham | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anne Strachan Garden | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|||||
Annik Taylor | Trustee | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.32k | £7.86k | £16.10k | £22.07k | £18.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.96k | £8.52k | £13.56k | £21.01k | £18.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 June 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 DECEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED ON 31 MAY 2016 as amended on 20 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES; AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC; IN THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 The Parklands
Catterall
PRESTON
PR3 1YT
- Phone:
- 07956115126
- Email:
- chair@lancastersingers.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window