THE JOHN HAMPDEN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
4 newsletters were published in 2023. 7 talks were delivered to other organisations. 2 articles by members were published by other organisations. The Society was represented at the BLHN conference and the launch of the BCWM database. Membership increased from 93 to 98. The 2024 AGM was held at Broughton Castle, Oxon. The strategic plan and a risk register were reviewed and updated.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 02 July 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Georgina Rogers | Chair | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Howell | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ralph Linnaeus Osborne | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Broomfield | Trustee | 09 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAM HEARN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Anthea Doris Coles | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.97k | £1.50k | £1.72k | £2.44k | £2.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.75k | £1.05k | £927 | £2.69k | £1.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED 21 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CHARACTER AND ACHIEVEMENTS OF THE GREAT SEVENTEENTH CENTURY PARLIAMENTARIAN, JOHN HAMPDEN, THE PATRIOT (1594-1643) 2. TO PROVIDE A LIBRARY AND ARCHIVE OF MATERIALS FOR RESEARCH INTO THE LIFE AND WORKS OF JOHN HAMPDEN, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 3 TO PRESERVE, CONSERVE AND ERECT MONUMENTS, AND TO PRESERVE AND CONSERVE ARTEFACTS, ASSOCIATED WITH JOHN HAMPDEN, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
134 Park Road
Chiswick
LONDON
W4 3HP
- Phone:
- 07833 376222
- Email:
- thetreasurer@johnhampden.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window