WELLS NELSON CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Coach Outings: Places of Interest/Theatre/Meals Speakers: Age Concern/Wells Hospital/Travel and Slides/Sound Therapy Games: Quiz/BringandBuy/Sing a Long/Bingo/Beetle Drive DIY: Members afternoons/Music from WW2/Reminiscence (film) Afternoon Tea/Christmas Party This is just a sample of activities. Members collected by Free Bus if required
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 15 August 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gwyneth Wheldon pinner | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frankie Hollands | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN HILL | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Sandra Phipps | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20k | £3.74k | £568 | £2.35k | £1.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.96k | £269 | £683 | £2.27k | £1.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUNE 2003.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES IN NORFOLK BY THE PROVISIONS OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Mill Court
WELLS-NEXT-THE-SEA
Norfolk
NR23 1HF
- Phone:
- 01328711478
- Email:
- sandraphipps28@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window