THE STAFFORDSHIRE REGIMENT MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust through a Museum and associated activities connects the public with its Army by telling the story of The Staffordshire Regiment, its forebears and successors, and their impact on world history and modern society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £23,663 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 09 April 2003: Standard registration
- 20 February 2023: Funds received from 1020550 STAFFORDSHIRE REGIMENT TERRITORIAL CHARITY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brig Simon Banton OBE | Chair | 14 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Richard Joynes | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Lt Col Mike Brigham MBE | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Louise Budd | Trustee | 31 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Damian Bailey | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
MAJOR (RETD) JIM MASSEY BA (HONS) | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
ANDY CLYRO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
BRIGADIER JIM TANNER OBE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MAJOR (RETD) MIKE SIMPKINS MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
COL ADRIAN WALTON MBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.08k | £53.15k | £198.86k | £155.37k | £135.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.28k | £89.75k | £100.64k | £113.21k | £146.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £22.30k | N/A | £23.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 April 2024 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 April 2024 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 APRIL 2002.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE: TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT IN THE HISTORY AND MILITARY ACCOMPLISHMENTS OF THE REGIMENT; TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY AND ENCOURAGE RECRUITMENT BY PUBLIC EXHIBITION OF THE COLLECTION IN A MUSEUM OR MUSEUMS OR SUCH OTHER PUBLIC PLACES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; AND TO CONSERVE, RESTORE, REPAIR, RE-CONSTRUCT AND PRESERVE OBJECTS IN THE COLLECTION.
Area of benefit
STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Staffordshire Regiment Museum Trust
The Staffordshire Regiment Museum
DMS Whittington
Lichfield
Staffordshire
WS14 9PY
- Phone:
- 01543 434394
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window