Financial history THE SPARK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1097058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £71.36k £60.92k £36.44k £65.24k £60.48k
Total expenditure £47.85k £62.21k £57.44k £62.60k £76.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A