Trustees THE SPARK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1097058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Danny Chesterman Chair 25 September 2017
None on record
Adam Brankin Trustee 01 March 2024
None on record
James Whitton Trustee 14 June 2019
None on record
Cathy Walker Trustee 18 December 2018
None on record
Kirsty Ginn Trustee 05 December 2016
None on record
TRACEY SORRELL Trustee 01 October 2012
None on record
IRENE HALL Trustee
None on record
SHEILA ROSARIA PATEL Trustee
THE TUNSTALL JUBILEE FOUNDATION
Received: On time