Financial history THE LONDON CARLBACH SHUL TRUST

Charity number: 1098107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £129.26k £74.03k £82.48k £40.41k £9.60k
Total expenditure £131.53k £73.96k £76.09k £56.08k £26.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A