Trustees WARWICK DISTRICT MOBILITY LIMITED
Charity number: 1097840

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MADELEINE ANN MORRISON | Chair | 27 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Susan Temple | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas James Wilkins | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Brunson | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Wendley | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thompson | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
AMELIA GILES | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GOTTS | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.