Financial history FRIENDS OF THE TREES

Charity number: 1100861
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010
Total gross income £257 £1.95k £1.55k £1.20k £460
Total expenditure £592 £186 £383 £1.63k £178
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A