HEADWAY SOMERSET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The rehabilitation of persons who have suffered brain injuries and who reside in the area covered by the Somerset Health Authority
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £128,503 from 2 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 08 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN PETTINGELL | Chair | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Julie Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Mellor | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Louise Cole | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Alan Jones | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Robert Hart | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Topping | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALYSON NORMAN | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Clark | Trustee | 19 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE STONEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £358.71k | £359.01k | £271.48k | £310.95k | £293.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £356.68k | £307.32k | £301.98k | £315.99k | £333.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £100.04k | £110.35k | £95.00k | £128.50k | £128.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 17TH MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED 17 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
THE REHABILITATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED BRAIN INJURIES AND WHO RESIDE IN THE COUNTY OF SOMERSET BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH SERVICES AND FACILITIES AS ARE REQUIRED FROM TIME TO TIME BY SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
Victoria House
Victoria Street
Taunton
Somerset
TA1 3FA
- Phone:
- 01823618519
- Email:
- liz@headwaysomerset.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window