CATHOLIC TRUST FOR ENGLAND AND WALES

Charity Number: 1097482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote the Catholic religion principally, but not exclusively, in England and Wales.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 May 2003: Standard registration
  • 13 April 2017: Funds received from 328705 THE CATHOLIC STUDENTS' TRUST OF ENGLAND AND WALES
  • 04 October 2018: Funds received from 265835 THE CATHOLIC FUND FOR CHAPLAINCIES IN HIGHER EDUCA...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CATHOLIC BISHOPS' CONFERENCE OF ENGLAND AND WALES (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RT REVD PETER BRIGNALL BISHOP Chair 05 July 2017
None on record
Paul Edris Hewitt Trustee 25 June 2024
None on record
John Hugh Davies Trustee 25 June 2024
WALSINGHAM TRUST
Received: On time
Sister Helen Bernadette Costigane Trustee 25 June 2024
DIOCESE OF HEXHAM AND NEWCASTLE
Received: On time
Liam Francis Kelly Trustee 25 June 2024
None on record
Carol LAWRENCE Trustee 15 March 2022
ARCHDIOCESE OF LIVERPOOL
Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
YOUTH MINISTRY TRUST
Received: 59 days late
THE CATHOLIC CHILDREN'S SOCIETY (SHREWSBURY DIOCESE) INC
Received: On time
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SHREWSBURY
Received: On time
LIVERPOOL ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESAN TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
USHAW TRUST
Received: On time
Rt Rev Tom Williams Trustee 15 March 2022
None on record
HENRIETTA TAMSIN EASTWOOD Trustee 22 January 2020
KIRWIN DAVIES FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE DEBORAH ROGERS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Sarah Kilmartin Trustee 22 January 2020
None on record
Cathy Corcoran Trustee 22 January 2020
None on record
Lyn Murray Trustee 05 December 2018
DIOCESE OF HEXHAM AND NEWCASTLE
Received: On time
ST JAMES PRIORY PROJECT LIMITED
Received: On time
Most Reverend Mark O'Toole Trustee 05 December 2018
THE VALLADOLID TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE VENERABLE ENGLISH COLLEGE TRUST
Received: On time
The Most Reverend Bernard Longley Trustee 05 December 2018
MATER ECCLESIAE COLLEGE
Received: On time
BIRMINGHAM CHURCHES TOGETHER
Received: On time
THE BRITISH TRUST FOR THE ECUMENICAL INSTITUTE FOR ADVANCED THEOLOGICAL STUDY IN JERUSALEM
Received: On time
MARYVALE INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Birmingham Newman University
Received: On time
BIRMINGHAM DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
Most Reverend Malcolm McMahon Trustee 05 December 2018
LIVERPOOL ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESAN TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
CHRIST'S AND NOTRE DAME COLLEGE, LIVERPOOL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.71m £13.38m £10.75m £9.18m £9.49m
Total expenditure £9.98m £11.94m £11.29m £9.75m £10.24m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.07m £10.44m £7.24m £4.48m £1.91m
Income - Other trading activities £1.14m £962.24k £1.39m £2.04m £2.19m
Income - Charitable activities £1.32m £857.08k £1.12m £1.50m £1.44m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £883.04k £630.53k £794.65k £968.48k £1.18m
Income - Other £302.55k £491.33k £205.03k £182.86k £2.77m
Income - Legacies £260.12k £128.68k £17.35k £35.24k £21.16k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.92m £10.89m £9.80m £7.40m £7.89m
Expenditure - Raising funds £265.08k £288.05k £257.20k £222.44k £212.18k
Expenditure - Governance £17.98k £17.57k £23.62k £80.72k £78.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £8.71m £4.08m £3.80m £349.96k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £213.91k £172.21k £198.89k £180.49k £212.18k
Expenditure - Other £790.20k £764.85k £1.24m £2.12m £2.13m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £6.88m £11.82m £11.64m £11.72m £11.43m
Long-term investments £35.46m £34.42m £40.24m £34.98m £35.62m
Other assets £12.74m £14.52m £13.17m £11.60m £11.93m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £6.11m £9.12m £10.06m £9.21m £9.81m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2021 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 October 2021 354 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
39 ECCLESTON SQUARE
LONDON
SW1V 1BX
Phone:
02079014808