PAY & EMPLOYMENT RIGHTS SERVICE (YORKSHIRE) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty for low paid employees by providing Employment Rights advice to worker and employers, particularly in the voluntary sector. We provide training in Employment Rights and Human Resources to voluntary sector organisations and advice agencies, promoting good non discriminatory practice in contracts and policies. We provide training to home workers and potential home workers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 May 2003: Standard registration
- PERS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Habiban Zaman | Chair | 04 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA RUTH JONES | Trustee |
|
||||||
MIKE QUIGGIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.04k | £76.78k | £107.48k | £61.00k | £70.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.05k | £76.30k | £92.14k | £75.89k | £91.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £38.42k | £38.42k | £38.42k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 DECEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 9 OCTOBER 2000, 7 OCTOBER 2002 AND 6 OCTOBER 2010. INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME ON 23 OCTOBER 1989 AND 18 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR POVERTY CAUSED BY LOW PAY; (B) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION AND THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY, PARTICULARLY IN EMPLOYMENT; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; (D) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
YORKSHIRE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Orchard Street
Savile Town
Dewsbury
West Yorkshire
WF12 9LT
- Phone:
- 01924 428033
- Email:
- ghani@pers.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window