CONCERNED FOR MENTAL HEALTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ORGANIZE DELIVERY OF CARE THROUGH COMMUNITY BASED AND HOSPITAL BASED PSYCHIATRIC SERVICES. HIRE AND TRAIN MENTAL HEALTH PROFESSIONALS TO RUN THESE PROGRAMS. CHANGE PHILOSOPHY OF CARE FOR MENTAL ILLNESS BY OFFERING & INITIATING SERVICES AND SUPPORTING/AUGMENTING ONGOING PROGRAMS. (THEN FOLLOW WITH WHATS ON THE ENTRY FOR CHARITY ON WEBSITE THANK YOU)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
- India
- Pakistan
Governance
- 02 July 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GHAZALA AFZAL | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.06k | £17.57k | £29.31k | £120 | £120 | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.77k | £34.77k | £16.04k | £9.98k | £7.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2022 | 326 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH MENTAL HEALTH DIFFICULTIES AND THEIR CARERS AND FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH EDUCATION AND BY THE PROVISION OF REHABILITATION AND FREE MEDICINES FOR COMMUNITIES IN INDIA, PAKISTAN AND NEPAL
Area of benefit
INDIA, PAKISTAN AND NEPAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 REDINGTON ROAD
LONDON
NW3 7RB
- Phone:
- 07973298047
- Website:
-
WWW.CONCERNFORMENTALHEATH.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window