FRIENDS OF ST PAUL'S SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various fund raising events throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 12 May 2003: Standard registration
- 09 September 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 September 2014: Re-registered
- FOSPS (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Donaldson | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Bannister | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Wren | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Cunningham | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Foster | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirstyn Donaldson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsay Wren | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Noblett | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jackson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Bruty | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chelsea Houghton | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Eccleston | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jolene Topping | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Phillips | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Taylor | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Darwen | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.27k | £2.55k | £7.14k | £9.68k | £6.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.23k | £1.68k | £9.86k | £8.63k | £7.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE FARINGTON ST PAUL'S C E SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Farington St. Pauls C Of E School
Croston Road
Farington Moss
LEYLAND
PR26 6PR
- Phone:
- 01772 336166
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window