BANGLADESHI EDUCATIONAL, CULTURAL & SOCIAL FORUM IN NEWHAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a supplementary school and a Mother Tongue School. We work with disadvantaged and socially excluded people particularly families, people who are unemployed from all sections of the community irrespective of their background, race, creed, religion, or age or disability. We also deliver all other charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 April 2003: Standard registration
- 24 April 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.16k | £0 | £9.85k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.69k | £9.46k | £7.18k | £5.50k | £1.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NEWHAM AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR MEMBERS OF THE BANGLADESHI COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN HARDSHIP BY: A) RELIEVING POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO THE SAID INHABITANTS IN NEED OF SUCH ADVICE THAT MAY INCLUDE WELFARE BENEFITS, HEALTH AND EDUCATION. B) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE AND OTHER SUBJECT CLASSES.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window