Accounts and annual returns LEOMINSTER JUNIOR SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1097476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 February 2025 241 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 November 2021 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 November 2021 497 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required