GREAT LAKES OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GLO works in partnership with local organisations in Central Africa (Burundi), to help people, providing financial, logistical and advisory assistance. Main focus is evangelism and discipleship through churches and schools, printing and teaching materials, fighting AIDS, street children and orphans, and encouraging an informed dialogue between different ethnic and religious groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,348,360
Donations and legacies | £1.33m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £10.18k | |
Investments | £5.59k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,244,129
Raising funds | £4.80k | |
Charitable activities | £1.24m | |
Other | £345 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.15k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.24m | |
Retained for future use | £104.23k |
People

10 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Burundi
Governance
- 29 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL ANTHONY SMITH | Chair | 25 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Wilmot | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Luke Daniel Johnson | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Justin David Hill | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 25 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
GAVIN EDWARD OLIVER HOWARD | Trustee | 25 September 2013 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN RONALD WHITE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20m | £1.67m | £1.51m | £1.62m | £1.35m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08m | £1.73m | £1.78m | £1.61m | £1.24m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.19m | £1.66m | £1.50m | £1.61m | £1.33m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £9.05k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £10.18k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £8.21k | £7.84k | £9.88k | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.31k | £2.31k | £1.78k | £1.06k | £5.59k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.06m | £1.73m | £1.78m | £1.60m | £1.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £13.36k | £4.61k | £2.71k | £4.55k | £4.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.59k | £9.52k | £9.76k | £14.53k | £13.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £792.51k | £1.44m | £1.49m | £1.28m | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £345 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £22.90k | £756 | £451 | £3.46k | £46.05k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £84.89k | £35.87k | £28.09k | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £848.88k | £732.07k | £492.51k | £520.43k | £607.16k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £21.81k | £29.40k | £18.48k | £8.81k | £12.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 MARCH 2003 as amended on 20 Jul 2022 as amended on 28 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
3.1 The charitable purposes of the Charity are: (a) to advance the Christian faith in Burundi and in such other parts of the world as the Trustees of the Charity may from time to time think fit and to fulfil such other purposes which are exclusively charitable according to the law of England and Wales and are connected with the charitable work of the Charity; (b) to relieve persons who are in conditions of need or hardship or who are aged or sick and to relieve the distress caused thereby in the said location and in such other parts of the world as the trustees may from time to time think fit; (c) to advance education in accordance with Christian principles by such means as the Trustees may consider appropriate including by means of establishing and operating any educational establishment or establishments in the said location and in such other parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the Trustees may from time to time think fit.
Area of benefit
BURUNDI AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREAT LAKES OUTREACH
1ST FLOOR TOWER HOUSE
LATIMER PARK
LATIMER
CHESHAM
HP5 1TU
- Phone:
- 01494766731
- Email:
- info@greatlakesoutreach.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window