GOSPEL PARTNERS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GPT is concerned with the furtherance of the Christian Faith in the UK and overseas with special emphasis on: Districts and areas of the UK where financial and other resources are less available; Particular ministries without adequate financial and other resources; The education, training, preparation and deployment of workers without adequate financial and other resources
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON HUMPHREY WESTLAND PILCHER | Chair |
|
||||||||||||
Kyla Lynne Malcolm | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
BRIAN WILLIAM O'DONOGHUE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
CARRIE SANDOM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.13k | £185.71k | £183.55k | £236.23k | £328.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.55k | £218.17k | £185.24k | £228.82k | £230.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS WITH SPECIAL EMPHASIS ON:- 1. DISTRICTS AND AREAS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM WHERE FINANCIAL AND OTHER RESOURCES ARE LESS AVAILABLE; 2. PARTICULAR MINISTRIES WITHOUT ADEQUATE FINANCIAL AND OTHER RESOURCES; 3. THE EDUCATION TRAINING PREPARATION AND DEPLOYMENT OF WORKERS WITHOUT ADEQUATE FINANCIAL AND OTHER RESOURCES, AND TO THIS END THE CO-OPERATION OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR THESE MINISTRIES AND WORKERS SO THAT THOSE WISHING TO COMMIT RESOURCES MAY WORK IN GOSPEL PARTNERSHIP WITH THOSE NEEDING THE HELP OF SUCH RESOURCES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. HELENS CHURCH
GREAT ST. HELENS
LONDON
EC3A 6AT
- Phone:
- 02072832231
- Email:
- info@gospelpartnerstrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window