STAPLES ROAD SCHOOLS PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity runs social events for the pupils and parents of Staples Road Primary School in order to raise additional funds to be spent for the benefit and enjoyment of the pupils at the school.These events also provide a sense of community for the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 14 May 2003: Standard registration
- S R S P A (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Leigh | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gerarda Kendrick | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Burgess | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Byers | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.90k | £12.15k | £45.49k | £49.87k | £49.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.45k | £5.03k | £48.76k | £44.66k | £33.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE LOUGHTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Queens Road
LOUGHTON
Essex
IG10 1RS
- Phone:
- 07956229875
- Email:
- Chair.pa.srs@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window