Financial history FETCHAM & DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1097536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £8.16k £337 £2.41k £9.57k £8.39k
Total expenditure £7.05k £4.96k £7.45k £12.22k £7.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A