Financial history RICHMOND UPON THAMES GATEWAY CLUB

Charity number: 1097711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.75k £7.26k £7.85k £19.36k £10.88k
Total expenditure £16.85k £8.86k £6.99k £16.39k £19.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.15k N/A N/A £4.15k £4.57k