THE PELVIC PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main aim of our charity is to provide women and healthcare professionals with information about best practice for the treatment and management of Pelvic Girdle Pain (PGP), formerly known as Symphysis Pubis Dysfunction, and to enable and empower women to access the right treatment. We provide an information website, run a telephone helpline and produce information leaflets and booklets.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH ANNE FISHBURN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Grace Pay | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Perrett | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angeline O'Connor | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Mary Pelham Manavis | Trustee | 03 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Howard | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Smith | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE WILDING | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Laura Leslie | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA MARTIN | Trustee | 12 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA SALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FIONA MARGUERITE TANKARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.78k | £15.91k | £22.64k | £11.92k | £10.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.22k | £13.61k | £7.52k | £18.72k | £17.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED 23 SEPTEMBER 2003. as amended on 09 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
To inform and support women with Pelvic Girdle Pain (PGP) and their families, carers and health-care professionals, and to promote effective treatment.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 THE CLEAVE
HARWELL
DIDCOT
OX11 0EL
- Phone:
- 01235820921
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window