Trustees THE PELVIC PARTNERSHIP
Charity number: 1100373

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH ANNE FISHBURN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Grace Pay | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Perrett | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angeline O'Connor | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Mary Pelham Manavis | Trustee | 03 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Howard | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Smith | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE WILDING | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Laura Leslie | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA MARTIN | Trustee | 12 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA SALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FIONA MARGUERITE TANKARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.