COLLINGWOOD CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
40 plus keep fit, yoga, pilates, bowls, parent & toddler groups, Citizens advice centre, various vocational classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £27,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Walsall
Governance
- 30 July 2003: Standard registration
- COLLINGWOOD CENTRE (Previous name)
- PHEASEY YOUTH PROJECT TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Hare | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Garth Howell | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Parry | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barry Douglas | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
HEIDI JANE SUMMERSBY | Trustee | 22 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ADAM LEE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 12 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DOUGLAS TOWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £198.72k | £180.01k | £201.38k | £217.44k | £234.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.25k | £154.02k | £171.36k | £221.20k | £238.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £33.00k | £24.50k | £21.00k | £22.50k | £27.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WALSALL AND IN PARTICULAR, THE IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF PHEASEY PARK FARM WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2. TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES.
Area of benefit
WALSALL AND IN PARTICULAR, THE IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF PHEASEY PARK FARM
Contact information
- Address:
-
COLLINGWOOD DRIVE
PHEASEY
GREAT BARR
BIRMINGHAM
B43 7NF
- Phone:
- 01213601484
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window