Financial history KEY CHANGES: POSITIVE MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH MUSIC LIMITED

Charity number: 1103774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £351.25k £430.80k £489.77k £332.15k £437.37k
Total expenditure £303.79k £327.46k £423.33k £550.82k £440.72k
Income from government contracts N/A £19.70k £19.70k £19.70k £23.50k
Income from government grants £57.29k £33.70k N/A £23.50k N/A