THE GUNMAKERS' COMPANY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust promotes the improvement of craft and technical skills employed in the gun and allied trades and in associated crafts, gives relief to individuals connected to the Worshipful Company of Gunmakers and their families and provides grants for any charitable purposes connected with the making or usage of guns, or for charitable causes in the City of London and Borough of Tower Hamlets
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin David Melville Curtis | Chair | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
marc newton | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francis Pearce | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gerard Hiscocks | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daryl Greatrex | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Graham Anthony | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lord Harry Frederick Alan Lawson Burnham | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Hayward Neale Horne | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD PETER KING | Trustee | 07 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BROWNING | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.90k | £40.47k | £64.63k | £112.15k | £148.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.91k | £38.78k | £24.07k | £44.63k | £50.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 7 OCTOBER 2003 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 17 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
(I)TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE IMPROVEMENT OF SPECIAL CRAFT AND TECHNICAL SKILLS EMPLOYED IN THE GUN AND ALLIED TRADES AND IN ASSOCIATED CRAFTS, BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PERSONS INVOLVED IN THESE TRADES AND CRAFTS, WHICH INCLUDE METAL WORK, WOODWORK, LEATHERWORK, CASE MAKING, ENGRAVING, COMPUTER SCIENCES CONNECTED WITH MACHINES AND BALLISTICS, AND ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCES CONNECTED WITH NOISE AND CARTRIDGE DESIGN. (II) TO RELIEVE INDIVIDUALS CONNECTED TO THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF GUNMAKERS AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO ARE IN NEED BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS. (III) TO PROVIDE GRANTS FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE MAKING OR USAGE OF GUNS. (IV) TO PROVIDE GRANTS FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE CITY OF LONDON OR OTHER PLACES IN WHICH THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF GUNMAKERS IS SITUATED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE CITY OF LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
PROOF HOUSE
48-50 COMMERCIAL ROAD
LONDON
E1 1LP
- Phone:
- 02074812695
- Email:
- clerk@gunmakers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window