CLYMBLAID GENEDLAETHOL MENYWOD CYMRU, WALES WOMEN'S NATIONAL COALITION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is for all women to be able to equally participate in and influence Welsh society. This vision is achieved through our position as an independant membership network for Women's organisations and individual women,activities and small projects which directly benefit women in Wales, and research to inform policy and decision-making and to raise awareness and identify new projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 24 November 2004: Standard registration
- 31 January 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WOMEN'S VOICE/LLAIS MERCHED (Working name)
- WWNC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.88k | £122.88k | £101.66k | £107.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.64k | £97.64k | £89.23k | £93.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 23 September 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 OCTOBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY (A) PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT AND IMPLEMENTATION OF POLICY THAT ADDRESSES INEQUALITY IN THE POSITION OF WOMEN AND ACCOMMODATES DIVERSITY AND (B) PROMOTING THE PARTICIPATION OF WOMEN IN DECISION MAKING AMONGST PUBLIC BODIES IN WALES.
Area of benefit
WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window