Financial history GURDJIEFF STUDIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1098600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £14.36k £8.34k £12.46k £11.55k £13.59k
Total expenditure £15.41k £7.11k £11.98k £14.90k £14.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A