NEWCASTLE AND NORTH TYNESIDE ALTERING IMAGES OF MENTALITY (AIM) GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Altering Images of Mentality aims to enable and empower the local community to address all issues surrounding mental health in an effort to tackle discrimination and to reduce the stigma felt by people with mental health problems. AIM evolved from Newcastle and North Tyneside Health Promotion Department's World Mental Health Day planning group but is now busy campaigning all year round.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 13 August 2003: Standard registration
- AIM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID BLAKE MILLER | Trustee | 17 February 2003 |
|
|
||||
JIM ARMSTRONG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.55k | £2.04k | £1.71k | £2.07k | £2.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £832 | £376 | £517 | £273 | £2.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2024 | 295 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 FEBRUARY 2003 AS AMENDED ON 8 JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ON ALL ISSUES SURROUNDING MENTAL HEALTH IN AN EFFORT TO TACKLE DISCRIMINATION AND TO REDUCE THE STIGMA FELT BY PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Chilli Studios
The Blackfriars Centre
Newbridge Street
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE1 2TQ
- Phone:
- 07810706285
- Email:
- dave@aimmentalhealth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window