REMINISCENCE LEARNING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of persons suffering from dementia by the provision of reminiscence therapy and to educate the families of persons suffering from dementia and health care workers in reminscence therapy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £61,169 from 2 government contract(s) and £23,333 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 16 August 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisbeth Jayne Dean | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Charles Withers | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|||||
William Tregillus | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Mandy Bridge | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Baverstock | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Jones | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £331.98k | £152.26k | £310.37k | £335.28k | £268.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £308.38k | £155.92k | £319.85k | £351.54k | £285.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £47.86k | £25.55k | £37.83k | £22.50k | £61.17k | |
|
Income from government grants | £53.00k | £20.05k | £15.43k | £20.26k | £23.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DEMENTIA BY THE PROVISION OF REMINISCENCE THERAPY. (B) TO EDUCATE THE FAMILIES OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DEMENTIA AND HEALTH CARE WORKERS IN REMINISCENCE THERAPY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCALLY IN SOMERSET, DEVON, CORNWALL AND DORSET.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hamlands
Chelston
WELLINGTON
Somerset
TA21 9HY
- Phone:
- 01823668676
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window