JESUS IN ME INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
J.I.M. International works to improve the physical, mental, and spiritual well-being of hurting communities by providing volunteer staffing, leadership, and outreach strategies to local partners. We collaborate with these charities, churches, and community organizations, in the UK and globally, to equip them with tools to effectively communicate the Gospel, and engage and serve people in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 13 January 2004: Standard registration
- JIM INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Theodore Bruun | Chair | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Jervis | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Krueger | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Anderson | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angelo Maurice Gonzales | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harry Christian Suitt | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lydia Mary Palmer | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Millership | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Szczepanski | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin David price | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
KAY BARBARA MILLERSHIP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102 | £63 | £85 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £86 | £27 | £77 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 May 2024 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 DECEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD. 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, AND THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL, MEDICAL AND HUMANITARIAN AID IN KENYA, INDIA, THE PHILIPPINES OR OTHER SPECIFIED REGIONS. 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE UK
Area of benefit
KENYA, INDIA, THE PHILIPPINES OR OTHER SPECIFIED REGIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 Haslemere Avenue
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST2 7AU
- Phone:
- 447305518683
- Email:
- xtadmin@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window