Trustees LARMENIER & SACRED HEART PTA
Charity number: 1097491

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ricky Elizabeth | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Mercier | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Philiotou | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalya Abrahim Yehuda Nunes | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Millon | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Harvey | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Freda Chisambi | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hayley O'Connell | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Matthews | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joana Matos | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Camila Acosta Alvarez | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giuliana Young | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eva Sanchis Arellano | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Valeria Richmond | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer McGinty | Trustee | 29 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.