Financial history REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ('RCCG') VICTORY CENTRE FOR ALL NATIONS

Charity Number: 1097800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £52.30k £58.23k £51.14k £72.80k £99.26k
Total expenditure £60.11k £62.00k £53.34k £70.20k £93.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.85k N/A N/A N/A