ENGLISH PRO MUSICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education of children and the publici n general in the art of music. This includes the giving of concerts, recitals and developing and taking part in workshop and other similar activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 September 2003: Standard registration
- ENGLISH PRO MUSIC (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE MORGAN | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Amanda Jane Gillham | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Frederick Gillham | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.54k | £500 | £14.23k | £30.18k | £23.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.20k | £288 | £15.13k | £30.64k | £22.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 AUGUST 2003. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 AUGUST 2003
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF MUSIC INCLUDING CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND TEACHING THE PLAYING OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS 2. THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF ORCHESTRAL AND CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY WAY OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Hartington Road
CHESTERFIELD
S41 0HE
- Phone:
- 01246563212
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window