THE BROMSGROVE ARTS CENTRE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
With its 301 seat auditorium, dance studio, meeting rooms and gallery, Artrix provides Bromsgrove with a year round programme of theatre, dance, music, cinema and exhibitions (437 events, screenings and 12 exhibitions in 2008/09) supported by an educational programme of classes, workshops and residencies. It does this through both direct promotion and partnership with other cultural organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 May 2003: Standard registration
- 27 January 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 27 January 2012: Funds transferred to 1124900 BROMSGROVE ARTS CENTRE TRUST
- ARTRIX (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 30/06/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £489.65k | £553.75k | £604.04k | £840.30k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £497.79k | £553.49k | £621.17k | £862.43k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £109 | £1.00k | £1.64k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £95.64k | £123.75k | £140.93k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £459.92k | £477.88k | £697.64k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £3.03k | £1.41k | £101 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £109 | £1.00k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £553.91k | £629.92k | £819.76k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £3.51k | £3.54k | £5.27k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £37.41k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 18 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | 31 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | 31 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 03 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 06 October 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 28 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 24 July 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23RD APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
2.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND INCREASE APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF ALL FORMS OF THE ARTS AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) THE ARTS OF DRAMA, DANCE, MUSIC AND PERFORMANCE AND VISUAL ARTS GENERALLY IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION:- 2.1.1 BY PRESENTING, PRODUCING, ORGANISING OR PROMOTING OR PROCURING TO BE PRESENTED, PRODUCED, ORGANISED OR PROMOTED EITHER ALONE OR WITH OTHERS PERFORMANCES OF MUSIC, DRAMA, DANCE OR ANY OTHER FORM OF ARTS; AND 2.1.2 BY PROVIDING ORGANISING OR PROMOTING CLASSES AND COURSES IN DRAMA, MUSIC, PAINTING OR ANY OTHER FORM OF THE ARTS. 2.2 TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window