PROACTIVE COMMUNITY ENDEAVOURS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve people who are vulnerable and excluded, by working together to assess the need, identify the issues that need to be addressed and devise a way forward to change their lives for the better, in particular, but not exclusively by the provision of various services; including childcare, advice and guidance, training and facilities and equipment for recreation purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,760 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 July 2003: Standard registration
- PACE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Xinhai Lin | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|||||
TRACEY ANN PARKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN WEAVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RYAN ATKINSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
EUAN LOCKWOOD | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR PHIL WEAVER | Trustee |
|
||||||
NATHAN WEAVER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.35k | £108.93k | £65.70k | £114.48k | £108.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.24k | £78.49k | £91.27k | £97.21k | £118.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.59k | £40.29k | £17.55k | N/A | £3.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 December 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 December 2022 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 FEBRUARY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE PERSONS (IRRESPECTIVE OF AGE, COLOUR OR CREED) WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION, TRAINING AND SUPPORT WHICH INTEGRATES THEM INTO THE COMMUNITY. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS. (3) TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EDUCATION, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID PERSONS, AND INTEGRATING THE SAID PERSONS INTO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 BELTON ROAD WEST EXTENSION
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE11 5XH
- Phone:
- 01509211194
- Email:
- helen@newsprings.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window