Governing document BRISTOL CATHEDRAL SCHOOL
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JULY 2003 AS AMENDED 2 DECEMBER 2004 AND 11 OCTOBER 2005 AND BY A CONDITIONAL SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 APRIL 2010 AND REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 SEPTEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN (INCLUDING ANY PERSON WHO REACHES THE AGE OF 19 WHILE STILL A PUPIL OF THE SCHOOL) BY THE PROVISION, CONDUCT AND MAINTENANCE OF A DAY SCHOOL AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CITY OF BRISTOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.