Accounts and annual returns SALTISFORD CHURCH

Charity number: 1098153
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 31 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 29 July 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2013 07 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 07 August 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2012 26 September 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 26 September 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2011 24 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 24 August 2012 On Time