Financial history SALTISFORD CHURCH

Charity number: 1098153
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £354.64k £348.36k £369.50k £201.01k £199.25k
Total expenditure £128.54k £125.77k £253.48k £171.97k £162.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A