HANBURY FARM PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AGED 15MONTHS TO 4YEARS OF AGE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 11 June 2003: Standard registration
- 15 June 2012: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 15 June 2012: Funds transferred to 1096526 PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.85k | £130.21k | £131.17k | £138.68k | £167.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.73k | £120.71k | £138.74k | £137.97k | £148.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 20 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 21 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 25 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 10 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 12 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 30TH APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION OR MEANS (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE BELGRAVE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window