NORTHAMPTONSHIRE RIGHTS AND EQUALITY COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Northamptonshire REC's vision is to promote a socially cohesive society in which diversity is recognised, celebrated and valued. We believe in social justice in Northamptonshire and support individuals who are victims of injustice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £39,300 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 30 May 2003: Standard registration
- NREC (Working name)
- NORTHAMPTONSHIRE RACIAL EQUALITY COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Sawyer | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Diepiriye Kuku-Siemons | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Aimee Paterson-Young | Trustee | 03 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ebenezer Laryea | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire Paterson-Young | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lovelace Owusu- Asante | Trustee | 21 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Toresen Mr | Trustee | 19 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALAINE CATHERINE HOLLAND | Trustee | 20 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE CROFTS | Trustee | 20 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
SEAN SILVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOE O'NEILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.55k | £151.58k | £151.58k | £175.76k | £227.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.85k | £131.00k | £131.00k | £147.31k | £149.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.80k | £21.80k | £21.80k | £21.80k | £39.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 JULY 2009 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
(A) TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF RACIAL DISCRIMINATION; (B) TO PROMOTE RACIAL EQUALITY; (C) TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS, (D) TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION AND TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY IN RESPECT OF GENDER, SEXUALITY, RELIGION, AGE AND DISABILITY, SO LONG AS THERE IS NO REDUCTION OF DILUTION OF THE WORK OF THE COMPANY IN RESPECT OF (A), (B) AND (C) ABOVE; ESPECIALLY IN THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AREA HEREINAFTER KNOWN AS "THE COMPANY'S AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pamzinda Northants Hub
32 Spring Lane
Wellingborough
Northamptonshire
NN8 1EY
- Phone:
- 01604400808
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window