UFFCULME TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise funds and encourage donations for the extra benefit of autistic children and young people at Uffculme School. We apply to Trusts for grants to support residential holidays (Douglas Turner Trust & Grantham Yorke Trust). Parents also undertake fundraising. In 2018 visits were supported from these grants. We also apply for grants for larger items, e.g. playground equipment."
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 06 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roseanne Marston | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW SCARROTT | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.48k | £0 | £2.43k | £38 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.72k | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 June 2021 | 235 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30/09/2013
Charitable objects
IN CO-OPERATION WITH THE SCHOOL COMMUNITY, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF UFFCULME SCHOOL, BIRMINGHAM; IN PARTICULAR TO ENGAGE IN FUNDRAISING ACTIVITIES AND SEEK CHARITABLE DONATIONS IN ORDER TO PROVIDE FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND PROVIDE EXTENDED OPPORTUNITIES FOR PUPILS.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
UFFCULME SPECIAL SCHOOL
QUEENSBRIDGE ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B13 8QB
- Phone:
- 01214645250
- Email:
- enquiry@uffculme.bham.sch.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window