STRUCTURAL GENOMICS CONSORTIUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enabling the future therapeutic relief of human suffering through genome-scale structural chemistry research. The Charity aims to provide open access to research in structural genomics, structural chemistry and computational chemistry as it relates to the improvement of human health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- Germany
- Japan
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 29 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ANKE MUELLER-FAHRNOW | Chair | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kallol Ray | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Judith Guenther | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Feng BI | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Oliver Kramer | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sujata Sharma | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Kiefer | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Dafydd Owen | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.91m | £10.33m | £4.75m | £0 | £14.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.52m | £8.53m | £3.59m | £4.00m | £2.42m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.91m | £10.33m | £4.75m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.52m | £8.53m | £3.59m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £137.00k | £1.64m | £108.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £5.44m | £6.89m | £2.43m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 27TH MARCH 2003, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5TH JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
1. TO AID THE RELIEF OF HUMAN SUFFERING AND THE CURE OF HUMAN ILLNESS BY ENGAGING IN, ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO MATTERS RELATING TO THE CAUSATION, PREVENTION, DIAGNOSTICS AND TREATMENT OF ILLNESS AND DISEASE AND THE USE AND PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND 2. TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE AND EDUCATION BY ENGAGING IN, ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO NOVEL PROTEIN STRUCTURES OF THERAPEUTIC INTEREST TO HUMAN HEALTH AND BY PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gibbs Building
215 Euston Road
London
NW1 2BE
- Phone:
- 416-946-0960
- Email:
- max.morgan@thesgc.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window