Financial history WESTBURY BAPTIST PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1097997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £111.26k £97.60k £98.71k £97.98k £118.57k
Total expenditure £99.89k £103.45k £97.06k £99.27k £110.74k
Income from government contracts £100.49k £66.67k £81.91k £76.93k £94.70k
Income from government grants N/A £15.92k N/A N/A N/A