Financial history HOLDING HANDS LANCASHIRE

Charity number: 1097650
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £133.07k £403.88k £138.71k £15.74k £600
Total expenditure £180.27k £310.98k £174.20k £74.78k £29.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A