DAN'S FUND FOR BURNS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the charity is to raise funds in order to donate these funds to adult (16 years and over) burns survivors and to establishments, which treat and care for burns survivors, primarily in UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 July 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Bentley | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Elaine Dorricott | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Kim MacLaren | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
EMMA DANKS | Trustee | 15 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
GREG WILLIAMS | Trustee | 27 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY DERBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER FRANCIS MASEFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Alistair Strong ACMA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.39k | £222.36k | £319.07k | £170.07k | £255.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.42k | £99.35k | £168.84k | £160.43k | £258.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") 1. TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE SUFFERING OF BURNS VICTIMS AND THEIR REHABILITATION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE; 2. TO PROMOTE MEDICAL RESEARCH AND EDUCATION INTO THE TREATMENT OF BURNS VICTIMS INCLUDING FIRST AID AND NURSING TO THE EXTENT THAT THE SAME ARE CHARITABLE AND EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Dagden Road
Shalford
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU4 8DD
- Phone:
- 07526 847699
- Email:
- info@dansfundforburns.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window